This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 09:17:22 (UTC).

Jones VS Sykes

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Jones filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Sykes. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1961

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES, ROY

Defendants

SYKES , DAMON JR

SYKES, DAMON JR

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

1/31/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Extension of Time Filed for Roy Jones

12/20/2019: Request Re: Extension of Time Filed for Roy Jones

Request Re: Extension of Time Granted

12/27/2019: Request Re: Extension of Time Granted

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

1/3/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Related Case Filed

11/12/2019: Notice of Related Case Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Damon Sykes Jr

9/23/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Damon Sykes Jr

First Amended Complaint Filed

9/30/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Damon Sykes Jr Filed

9/30/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Damon Sykes Jr Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

9/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Case Management Statement of Roy Jones Filed

9/30/2019: Case Management Statement of Roy Jones Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/22/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/22/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 10/22/2019 03:00 PM D- 19

6/7/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 10/22/2019 03:00 PM D- 19

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/7/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

6/4/2019: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/4/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roy Jones

6/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roy Jones

Proof of Service by Mail Complaint in Ejectment and for Damages Filed

6/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Complaint in Ejectment and for Damages Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 19 date: 02/11/2020 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 02/11/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Extension of Time Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Extension of Time Filed for Roy Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Additional Court Fees As to Roy Jones Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/22/2019 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Roy Jones Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Roy Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Additional Court Fees Filed for Roy Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Complaint in Ejectment and for Damages Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Roy Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less