This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 21:00:53 (UTC).

Johnston VS Scott Hien Nguyen, Inc

Case Summary

On 04/03/2007 Johnston filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Scott Hien Nguyen, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEANNA LYON,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8680

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DEANNA LYON,

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

JOHNSTON, DOORIS G JR

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

SCOTT HIEN NGUYEN, INC

 

Court Documents

Order Destruction of Exhibits Filed

11/26/2007: Order Destruction of Exhibits Filed

Informal Correspondence to / from Plaintiff Received

7/10/2007: Informal Correspondence to / from Plaintiff Received

Judgment Entered

7/6/2007: Judgment Entered

Miscellaneous Judge's Typed Decision Filed

7/6/2007: Miscellaneous Judge's Typed Decision Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

7/6/2007: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

7/6/2007: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

7/6/2007: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/06/2007 08:30 AM D- 604

5/21/2007: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/06/2007 08:30 AM D- 604

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/13/2007: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/05/2007 01:30 PM D- 607

4/5/2007: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/05/2007 01:30 PM D- 607

Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Dooris G Johnston Jr Granted

4/3/2007: Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Dooris G Johnston Jr Granted

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/3/2007: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Destruction of Exhibits Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformal Correspondence to / from Plaintiff Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Deanna Lyon, Pro Tem; Department: Dept 604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Judge's Typed Decision Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/06/2007 08:30 AM D- 604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/05/2007 01:30 PM D- 607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Dooris G Johnston Jr Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2007
  • DocketApplication Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed for Dooris G Johnston Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2007
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 05/02/2007 01:30 PM D- 607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less