This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 03:48:51 (UTC).

Johnson VS Tran

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tran. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3047

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNSON, ALLEE J

THE ESTATE OF NOELLE JOHNSON

JOHNSON, KARALINE

JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER

JOHNSON, JEWELAH

JOHNSON, LORIN

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS HOLDINGS, LLC

TAKATA CORPORATION

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

QUANY, DUNG THANH THAI

THI, NGUYEN THANH THUY

LIMAS, CHRISTOPHER

TK HOLDINGS

TRAN, DANG NGUYEN HAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCELWAINE-LETO, ALICIA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/25/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/25/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/23/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/16/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/17/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/3/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/3/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Dismissal As to Defendant: General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings, LLC, General Motors LLC,

7/19/2021: Dismissal As to Defendant: General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings, LLC, General Motors LLC,

Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Plaintiff Christopher Johnson

7/14/2021: Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Plaintiff Christopher Johnson

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party General Motors Company, General Motors H

7/14/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party General Motors Company, General Motors H

Compliance Hearing 01/13/2022 09:00 AM D- 25

7/19/2021: Compliance Hearing 01/13/2022 09:00 AM D- 25

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

6/21/2021: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

6/21/2021: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

6/21/2021: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

6/21/2021: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Lorin Johnson

6/16/2021: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Lorin Johnson

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 07/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 01/13/2022 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: General Motors Company, General Motors Holdings, LLC, General Motors LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party General Motors Company, General Motors H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Plaintiff Christopher Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Karaline Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Jewelah Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Lorin Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Allee J Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christopher Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAKATA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TK HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCELWAINE-LETO ALICIA