This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 19:09:51 (UTC).

Johnson VS Johnson

Case Summary

On 07/24/2003 Johnson filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALICE VILARDI, JACOB BLEA III and CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8272

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ALICE VILARDI

JACOB BLEA III

CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, KIMBERLY ANN

Respondent

JOHNSON, RANDYLEE LITCHFIELD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketRegistration of Out-of-State Custody Decree Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 08/31/2012 09:00 AM D- 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Modification; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous Findings and Order after Hearing dated 4/10/09 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • DocketLetter re Exparte Communication Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Registration of Out-of-State Custody Decree As to Kimberly Ann Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Kimberly Ann Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2004
  • DocketResponsive Declaration re: Order to Show Cause Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2004
  • DocketProof of Service on Order to Show Cause re Modification As to Kimberly Ann Johnson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 05/04/2004 09:00 AM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Modification Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2003
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • DocketRequest for Production of an Income and Expense Declaration after Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Randylee Litchfield Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2003
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2003
  • DocketNotice of Registration of Out-of-State Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2003
  • DocketRegistration of Out-of-State Custody Decree Filed

    Read MoreRead Less