This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 07:26:22 (UTC).

Jeld-Wen, Inc. VS Livermore MultiFamily Owner LLC

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Jeld-Wen, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Livermore MultiFamily Owner LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1377

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JELD-WEN, INC.

Defendants

KATERRA CONSTRUCTION LLC

LIVERMORE MULTIFAMILY OWNER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SIEVING, RICHARD N.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/2/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

9/2/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 06/08/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/31/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeld-Wen, Inc.

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeld-Wen, Inc.

Complaint - Other Filed

8/31/2021: Complaint - Other Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Livermore MultiFamily Owner LLC Filed

9/7/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Livermore MultiFamily Owner LLC Filed

Notice of of Filing Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

9/14/2021: Notice of of Filing Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

Proof of Service Filed

9/13/2021: Proof of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Filing Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Livermore MultiFamily Owner LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/08/2022 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeld-Wen, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Construction LLC Jointly Administered under 21-31861. is a litigant

Latest cases where JELD-WEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sieving, Richard Norman