This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 05:35:02 (UTC).

Jarvis VS Simpson

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Jarvis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Simpson. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2391

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JARVIS, MICHAEL

Defendants

CMC COMMERCIAL METALS COMAPNY

CMC STEEL FABRCATORS, INC

SIMPSON, ZACKARY ALAN

CMC COMMERCIAL METALS COMPANY

CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC.

SIMPSON, ZACHARY ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TIEMANN, PETER

URBANIC, JOSEPH T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/23/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/03/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

6/23/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/03/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/21/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Jarvis

6/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Jarvis

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

6/21/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Zackary Alan Simpson Filed

9/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Zackary Alan Simpson Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to CMC commercial metals Comapny Filed

9/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to CMC commercial metals Comapny Filed

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

10/1/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for CMC Commercial Metals Company, CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., Zachary Al

9/23/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for CMC Commercial Metals Company, CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., Zachary Al

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 04/14/2023 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 05/05/2023 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/23/2023 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for CMC Commercial Metals Company, CMC Steel Fabricators, Inc., Zachary Al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Zackary Alan Simpson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to CMC commercial metals Comapny Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/03/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Michael Jarvis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Urbanic, Joseph T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiemann, Peter B