Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 18:44:44 (UTC).

Jamieson VS The Permanente Medical Group Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Jamieson filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The Permanente Medical Group Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1111

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMIESON, DEBORAH

Defendants

SIVAMURTHY, M.D., NAYAN

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC

HAYNES, M.D., CLAUDIA

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

GHOSH,M.D., PRADIPTA

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

LAGISETTI, DPM, RISHIKA

LEE,M.D., MELVIN

LEM, DPM, LANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZINN, CARTER M.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Filed

4/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc Filed

4/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Permanente Medical Group Inc. Filed

4/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Permanente Medical Group Inc. Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

3/12/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/12/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/8/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Deborah Jamieson

3/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Deborah Jamieson

Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

3/8/2021: Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 17; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to The Permanente Medical Group Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Deborah Jamieson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Medical Malpractice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZINN, CARTER M.