This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 00:47:50 (UTC).

James VS Citistaff Solutions INC.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 James filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Citistaff Solutions INC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9046

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES, MARISSA

Defendants

CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS INC.

TESLA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCARDIGLI, NICHOLAS J.

LANGBERG, AARON D.

SLATER, CHARLES C.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement of Citistaff Solutions INC. Filed

9/7/2021: Case Management Statement of Citistaff Solutions INC. Filed

Case Management Statement of Marissa James Filed

9/8/2021: Case Management Statement of Marissa James Filed

Case Management Statement of Tesla, INC. Filed

9/9/2021: Case Management Statement of Tesla, INC. Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

9/10/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, INC. Filed

6/7/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, INC. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Citistaff Solutions INC. Filed

6/7/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Citistaff Solutions INC. Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Citistaff Solutions INC.

6/30/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Citistaff Solutions INC.

Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, INC.

6/21/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, INC.

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

5/11/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marissa James

5/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marissa James

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/11/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

5/17/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/17/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Complaint - Other Employment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/02/2023 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/19/2023 11:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 05/30/2023 09:30 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Tesla, INC. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Marissa James Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Citistaff Solutions INC. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Citistaff Solutions INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Citistaff Solutions INC. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, INC. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marissa James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Tesla Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron David Langberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCARDIGLI, NICHOLAS J.