This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/08/2021 at 20:14:18 (UTC).

Jacobsen-Rios VS Sun Light & Power

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Jacobsen-Rios filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sun Light Power. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1179

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACOBSEN-RIOS, TAYLOR

Defendants

SANCHEZ, LUIS DEMIAN

SUN LIGHT & POWER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KANG-GORDON, SUSAN Y

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

11/13/2020: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Taylor Jacobsen-Rios

11/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Taylor Jacobsen-Rios

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/13/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/7/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

12/7/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 03/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

2/8/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

2/4/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

1/13/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Luis Demian Sanchez Filed

1/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Luis Demian Sanchez Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

1/13/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sun Light & Power Filed

1/13/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sun Light & Power Filed

Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence Filed

1/13/2021: Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Luis Demian Sanchez Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Sun Light & Power Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Reasonable Diligence Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Taylor Jacobsen-Rios

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN LIGHT & POWER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANG-GORDON, SUSAN Y.H.