This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/26/2021 at 14:58:55 (UTC).

Jackson VS Madison Marquette Real Estate Servies, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Jackson filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Madison Marquette Real Estate Servies, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2581

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON , STEVEN

Defendants

MADISON MARQUETTE REAL ESTATE SERVIES, INC.

COLEMAN , LORI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GRANAHAN, CONOR

DALE, CONOR J.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

12/11/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

1/28/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

1/25/2021: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

1/26/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/26/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

12/14/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/26/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Settlement Filed for Steven Jackson

9/29/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Steven Jackson

Compliance Hearing 11/16/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

9/30/2020: Compliance Hearing 11/16/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Answer to Complaint Filed for Madison Marquette Real Estate Servies, Inc. , Lori Coleman

8/11/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Madison Marquette Real Estate Servies, Inc. , Lori Coleman

Case Management Statement of Steven Jackson Filed

7/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Steven Jackson Filed

Case Management Statement of Madison Marquette Real Estate Servies, Inc. , Lori Coleman Filed

8/10/2020: Case Management Statement of Madison Marquette Real Estate Servies, Inc. , Lori Coleman Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/17/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

6/11/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Case Management Statement of Steven Jackson Filed

5/27/2020: Case Management Statement of Steven Jackson Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

6/2/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Steven Jackson

1/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Steven Jackson

Initial Case Management Conference 06/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

1/31/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/31/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 03/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 01/26/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 12/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 10/12/2021 09:30 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 11/16/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Steven Jackson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Steven Jackson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Madison Marquette Real Estate Servies, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/15/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Steven Jackson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MADISON MARQUETTE REAL ESTATE SERVIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALE, CONOR J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANAHAN, CONOR