This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 09:16:10 (UTC).

Jackson VS Kim

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Jackson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kim. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0301

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON, CHEQUECCHYA

Defendant

KIM, KENNETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TEDDINGTON, GINA C.

CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

8/16/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chequecchya Jackson

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chequecchya Jackson

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/16/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/26/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 01/06/2022 03:00 PM D- 514

8/26/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 01/06/2022 03:00 PM D- 514

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/07/2022 02:00 PM D- 514

9/14/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/07/2022 02:00 PM D- 514

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kenneth Kim Filed

9/3/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kenneth Kim Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/22/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Kenneth Kim

9/22/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Kenneth Kim

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Kenneth Kim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/07/2022 02:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kenneth Kim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/06/2022 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chequecchya Jackson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teddington, Gina C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOLAKIAN, KEVIN K.