This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/04/2021 at 03:53:22 (UTC).

iTradenetwork, Inc. VS Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 iTradenetwork, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7019

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ITRADENETWORK, INC.

Defendants

SOURCE1 PURCHASING, LLC OF TENNESSEE

SOURCE1 PURCHASING, LLC OF DELAWARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ANDERSON, ALLAN E.

SKINNER, JEFFREY D.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

10/1/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

7/6/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey D. Skinner as Attorney for iTradenetwork, Inc. Filed

6/18/2020: Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey D. Skinner as Attorney for iTradenetwork, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of iTradenetwork, Inc. Filed

6/22/2020: Case Management Statement of iTradenetwork, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee, Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Delawa

6/23/2020: Case Management Statement of Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee, Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Delawa

Withdrawal of Attorney Filed for iTradenetwork, Inc.

6/25/2020: Withdrawal of Attorney Filed for iTradenetwork, Inc.

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

1/10/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Source1 Purchasing, LL

1/15/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Source1 Purchasing, LL

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

1/21/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

Answer to Complaint Filed for Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee, Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Delaw

1/31/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee, Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Delaw

Proof of Service (Amended) on Filed

2/3/2020: Proof of Service (Amended) on Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of

2/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty As to Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Delaware Filed

12/20/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Delaware Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee Filed

12/20/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/29/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

12/17/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/29/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/13/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 08/09/2021 09:30 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/23/2021 11:00 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWithdrawal of Attorney Filed for iTradenetwork, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Source1 Purchasing, LL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Tennessee Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Source1 Purchasing, LLC Of Delaware Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/29/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for iTradenetwork, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less