Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 05:00:10 (UTC).

Iraheta VS 763 Blossom Associates, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Iraheta filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 763 Blossom Associates, L L C. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1035

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ORELLANA, JOSE EZEQUIEL

GARCIA, ROSA CASTRO

IRAHETA, SANDRA

Defendants

ANCHETA, JUNELL C.

763 BLOSSOM ASSOCIATES, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SALINAS, ROBERT

O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint Filed for 763 Blossom Associates, L.L.C., Junell C. Ancheta

8/20/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for 763 Blossom Associates, L.L.C., Junell C. Ancheta

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

9/11/2020: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/15/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/6/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Junell C. Ancheta Filed

7/9/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Junell C. Ancheta Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to 763 Blossom Associates, L.L.C. Filed

7/9/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to 763 Blossom Associates, L.L.C. Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

5/18/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

5/19/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

Summons Issued and Filed

5/14/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

5/14/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/14/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sandra Iraheta

5/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sandra Iraheta

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/13/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint Other Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 02/18/2022 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/16/2021 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 03/11/2022 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for 763 Blossom Associates, L.L.C., Junell C. Ancheta

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 08/06/2020 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to 763 Blossom Associates, L.L.C. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Junell C. Ancheta Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sandra Iraheta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALINAS, ROBERT