This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:21:16 (UTC).

Insurance Company of The West VS Thermoscape

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Insurance Company of The West filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Thermoscape. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4116

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendant

THERMOSCAPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LLOYD, PRISCILLA W

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Insurance Company of The West

9/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Insurance Company of The West

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

9/28/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/28/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/1/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 02/22/2022 03:00 PM D- 15

10/1/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 02/22/2022 03:00 PM D- 15

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/22/2022 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Insurance Company of The West

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LLOYD PRISCILLA