This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 01:11:10 (UTC).

Innovative Construction Company VS Vila Construction Company

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Innovative Construction Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Vila Construction Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1293

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INNOVATIVE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

OAKLAND UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

THE VERTEX COMPANIES, INC,

VILA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

TULUM INNOVATIVE ENGINEERING, INC.

VILA TULUM JOINT VENTURE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LAST JR., WILLIAM C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/10/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

6/10/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/7/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Innovative Construction Company

6/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Innovative Construction Company

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

6/7/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

7/8/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

First Amended Complaint Filed

7/8/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

8/25/2021: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

8/25/2021: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Dismissal As to Defendant: Oakland Unified School District Entered

8/18/2021: Dismissal As to Defendant: Oakland Unified School District Entered

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Oakland Unified School District Filed

8/12/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Oakland Unified School District Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

8/12/2021: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

8/12/2021: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

8/12/2021: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Oakland Unified School District Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Oakland Unified School District Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Innovative Construction Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vila Contruction Company is a litigant

Latest cases where THE VERTEX COMPANIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where INNOVATIVE CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OAKLAND UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant