This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/02/2020 at 06:55:25 (UTC).

In Re: Vaidehi Fnu

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 In Re Vaidehi Fnu was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK ROESCH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8451

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

FRANK ROESCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FNU, VAIDEHI

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing name Filed

6/30/2020: Decree Changing name Filed

First Amended Petition Filed

6/24/2020: First Amended Petition Filed

Civil Uncontested Commenced and Continued

6/26/2020: Civil Uncontested Commenced and Continued

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled

6/26/2020: Order to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled

Proof of Publication As to Vaidehi Fnu Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Publication As to Vaidehi Fnu Filed

Hearing Reset to Civil Uncontested 06/26/2020 11:00 AM D- 17

4/3/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Uncontested 06/26/2020 11:00 AM D- 17

Hearing Reset to Civil Uncontested 05/08/2020 11:00 AM D- 17

3/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Uncontested 05/08/2020 11:00 AM D- 17

Civil Uncontested Commenced and Continued

2/14/2020: Civil Uncontested Commenced and Continued

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled

2/14/2020: Order to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled

Petition for Change of Name Filed

12/27/2019: Petition for Change of Name Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Vaidehi Fnu

12/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Vaidehi Fnu

Proposed Order Received

12/27/2019: Proposed Order Received

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner

12/27/2019: Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing name Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Change of Name; Judge: Frank Roesch; Department: Dept 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Uncontested dept: 17 date: 07/24/2020 time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Uncontested Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication As to Vaidehi Fnu Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Uncontested 06/26/2020 11:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Uncontested 05/08/2020 11:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Change of Name; Judge: Frank Roesch; Department: Dept 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Uncontested dept: 17 date: 03/27/2020 time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Uncontested Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Vaidehi Fnu Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Vaidehi Fnu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Uncontested 02/14/2020 11:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Vaidehi Fnu

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name Filed

    Read MoreRead Less