This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 18:19:21 (UTC).

In re: The Saponara 1992 Trust

Case Summary

On 02/24/2006 In re The Saponara 1992 Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CARL W. MORRIS, YOLANDA NORTHRIDGE, JON S. TIGAR, GEORGE C. HERNANDEZ, JR., KEITH FUDENNA and SHARON ISENHOUR,. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6878

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2006

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

CARL W. MORRIS

YOLANDA NORTHRIDGE

JON S. TIGAR

GEORGE C. HERNANDEZ, JR.

KEITH FUDENNA

SHARON ISENHOUR,

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RISSONE, MELINA

ARVIN, ROSE

Not Classified By Court

THE SAPONARA 1992 TRUST

SAPONARA, VINCENT

Other

CEDERBORG, MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BARULICH, PAUL J.

RAY, ANN S

TRAN, SANH B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Rose Arvin, Melina Rissone

3/1/2006: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Rose Arvin, Melina Rissone

Proof of Personal Service on Petition to Remove Trustee As to The Saponara 1992 Trust Filed

3/6/2006: Proof of Personal Service on Petition to Remove Trustee As to The Saponara 1992 Trust Filed

Response Pet. for Removal of Co-Trustee; Fees & Costs Filed

4/3/2006: Response Pet. for Removal of Co-Trustee; Fees & Costs Filed

Petition for Removal of Co-Trustees; Attny Fees Filed by Vincent SAPONARA

4/3/2006: Petition for Removal of Co-Trustees; Attny Fees Filed by Vincent SAPONARA

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

4/3/2006: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Vincent SAPONARA

4/3/2006: Notice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Vincent SAPONARA

Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION FOR REMOVAL Filed

4/7/2006: Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION FOR REMOVAL Filed

Miscellaneous of Guardian Ad Litem Filed

5/10/2006: Miscellaneous of Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Correspondence (General) Filed

5/12/2006: Correspondence (General) Filed

Miscellaneous Respondents v. Saponara's Opposition to Ex-Parte App. for an Order Shortening Notice o

5/12/2006: Miscellaneous Respondents v. Saponara's Opposition to Ex-Parte App. for an Order Shortening Notice o

Miscellaneous /Supplemental opposition by Vincent Saponara to ex parte application shortening notice

5/15/2006: Miscellaneous /Supplemental opposition by Vincent Saponara to ex parte application shortening notice

Miscellaneous /Proof of service via facsimile Filed

5/15/2006: Miscellaneous /Proof of service via facsimile Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

5/15/2006: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Rose Arvin, Melina Rissone

5/16/2006: Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Rose Arvin, Melina Rissone

Letter dated 15 May 2006 to Probate Examiners Filed

5/16/2006: Letter dated 15 May 2006 to Probate Examiners Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION FOR REMOVAL (ARVIN & RISSONE PETN) Filed

5/19/2006: Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION FOR REMOVAL (ARVIN & RISSONE PETN) Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION FOR REMOVAL (SAPONARA'S PETN) Filed

5/19/2006: Probate Examiner's Check List PETITION FOR REMOVAL (SAPONARA'S PETN) Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

5/19/2006: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Petition to Remove Trustee; Judge: Carl W. Morris; Department: Dept 201

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrust Hearing Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • DocketDropped compliance hearing on 12/28/10; stip. and order filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Melina Rissone Dated 8/2/2010 (Ex Parte Communication) Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of entry of dismissal & proof of service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Request for dismissal entire action w/ prejudice as to petition for removal of co-trus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Exparte Filed for Rose Arvin, Melina Rissone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Vincent SAPONARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Petition to Remove Trustee; Judge: Carl W. Morris; Department: Dept 201

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Vincent SAPONARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • DocketProbate 05/26/2006 02:00 PM D- 602

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Removal of Co-Trustees; Attny Fees Filed by Vincent SAPONARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse Pet. for Removal of Co-Trustee; Fees & Costs Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Petition to Remove Trustee As to The Saponara 1992 Trust Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Rose Arvin, Melina Rissone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • DocketHearing Reset to Probate 04/14/2006 02:00 PM D- 602

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • DocketProbate 04/14/2006 01:30 PM D- 602

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • DocketPetition to Remove Trustee Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARULICH, PAUL J.