This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 00:00:45 (UTC).

In re: THE CHICK ADMINISTRATIVE TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 In re THE CHICK ADMINISTRATIVE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUBEN SUNDEEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3227

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RUBEN SUNDEEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MULHALL , PAULA A.

Not Classified By Court

THIEROLF, RICHARD

CHICK, GEOFFREY

THE CHICK ADMINISTRATIVE TRUST

MASSIE, KARLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COLLIER, RICHARD JAMES

NELSON, STACIE P.

ZABRONSKY, ANDREW

GORDON, STUART M.

SEIDEL, EDWARD` L

 

Court Documents

Examiner's Notes re Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, 9/29/20

9/28/2020: Examiner's Notes re Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, 9/29/20

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Richard Thierolf

8/19/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Richard Thierolf

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

8/23/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Karla Massie, Geoffrey Chick

5/13/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Karla Massie, Geoffrey Chick

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

5/15/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Richard Thierolf, Karla Massie, Geoffrey

3/15/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Richard Thierolf, Karla Massie, Geoffrey

Order Stipulation and Order Continuing Hearing Filed

3/18/2019: Order Stipulation and Order Continuing Hearing Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

3/18/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

10/10/2018: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for Paula A. Mulhall

10/3/2018: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for Paula A. Mulhall

Response to Ex-Parte Application for Order Appointing Paula A. Mulhall as Temp. Trustee Filed

10/4/2018: Response to Ex-Parte Application for Order Appointing Paula A. Mulhall as Temp. Trustee Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 201; Action: Petition re Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Probate 04/21/2021 03:30 PM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail: : Notice of Hearing (Amended) As to Stuart M. Gordon Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Probate 04/20/2021 02:40 PM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Petition; Judge: Ruben Sundeen; Department: Dept 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes re Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, 9/29/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail of Notice of Petition to Administer Estate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Paula A. Mulhall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Trustee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail on Response to Ex-Parte Application for Order Appointing Paula A. Mulhall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Ex-Parte Application for Order Appointing Paula A. Mulhall as Temp. Trustee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for Paula A. Mulhall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketProbate 02/06/2019 10:00 AM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketPetition re Trust Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zabronsky, Andrew

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEIDEL, EDWARD` L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON STUART M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON, STACIE P.