Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 16:50:13 (UTC).

In Re: Rajeswary Kuttappan

Case Summary

On 01/14/2002 In Re Rajeswary Kuttappan was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREMONT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7514

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fremont Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

FREMONT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KUTTAPPAN, RAJESWARY ANILRAJ

 

Court Documents

Petition for Change of Name Filed

1/14/2002: Petition for Change of Name Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rajeswary Anilraj Kuttappan

1/14/2002: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rajeswary Anilraj Kuttappan

Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner

1/14/2002: Order to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner

Affidavit of Publication Filed

2/20/2002: Affidavit of Publication Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/1/2002: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Decree Changing name Filed

3/1/2002: Decree Changing name Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2002
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Change of Name; Judge: Fremont Judge; Department: Dept 603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDecree Changing name Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2002
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Publication Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Change of Name Filed for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2002
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause 03/01/2002 08:30 AM D- 603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rajeswary Anilraj Kuttappan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name Filed

    Read MoreRead Less