Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 06:29:41 (UTC).

Ilinetsky VS The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Ilinetsky filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0538

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ILINETSKY, YOEL

ILINETSKY, ZOHAR

ILINETSKY, YAEL

ILINETSKY, GABRIELLA

Defendants

PHAN, NGOC M.D

BISHOP DONNELLY, ELIZABETH ANNE CNM

SUITOS, KRISTI LYNN M.A

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

MARK-DRAISIN, SARAH PEIDEN M.D

BASTIAN, MS., LCGC, ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROUDA, DAVID

PIERROU, YVONNE M.

MURO, MARK A

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/12/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

2/11/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

11/12/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Anne Bastian, MS., LCGC, Ngoc Phan M.D, S

6/2/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Anne Bastian, MS., LCGC, Ngoc Phan M.D, S

Disassociation of Counsel Filed

7/10/2020: Disassociation of Counsel Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/9/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. Filed

2/14/2020: Case Management Statement of The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. Filed

Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted

2/3/2020: Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted

Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Action Filed

1/17/2020: Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Action Filed

Declaration of David Rouda Filed

1/21/2020: Declaration of David Rouda Filed

Supplemental Declaration in Support Of Petition To Compel Filed

1/24/2020: Supplemental Declaration in Support Of Petition To Compel Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

12/23/2019: Notice of Change of Address Filed

First Amended Complaint Filed

11/1/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Notice of of Application For Appointmnet of Guardian Ad Litem Filed

11/1/2019: Notice of of Application For Appointmnet of Guardian Ad Litem Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/25/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yoel Ilinetsky

10/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yoel Ilinetsky

Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Yael Ilinetsky

10/24/2019: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Yael Ilinetsky

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 25 date: 01/05/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: Arbitration; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/12/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Application For Appointmnet of Guardian Ad Litem Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Gabriella Ilinetsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem As to Yael Ilinetsky Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Application For Ad Litem Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Yael Ilinetsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yoel Ilinetsky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Medical Malpractice Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROUDA DAVID LAWRENCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A Muro