Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 01/20/2021 at 00:00:38 (UTC).

IDS Property Casualty Insuran VS Pleskach Plumbing, a corpor

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 IDS Property Casualty Insuran filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pleskach Plumbing, a corpor. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6044

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

PLESKACH , KEITH

PLESKACH PLUMBING, A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHWARZ, MARC A.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/20/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

10/27/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/20/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

11/18/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Statement of IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company Filed

10/5/2020: Case Management Statement of IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/1/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/18/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

3/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/18/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

Case Management Statement of IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company Filed

1/21/2020: Case Management Statement of IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/3/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

10/11/2019: Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

10/11/2019: Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

10/18/2019: Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

11/4/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/19/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

9/19/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company

Declaration RE Venue Filed

9/19/2019: Declaration RE Venue Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 02/03/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

9/23/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 02/03/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/20/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/13/2020 01:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot Found or Non Service Return Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot Found or Non Service Return Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot Found or Non Service Return Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot Found or Non Service Return Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/03/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration RE Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARZ MARC A.