This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 05:22:37 (UTC).

Hussian VS Davis

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Hussian filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6295

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

HUSSIAN , HARRY

DAVIS , ANA Z

HIGLEY, KIMBERLY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DAVIS , ANA Z

DAVIS , JOHN

HIGLEY, KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RUBKE, MARK E.

QUAN, ANDREW

COWAN, JOHN

COWAN, JOHN E.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/4/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/30/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/13/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/13/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

4/22/2021: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/7/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/7/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Ana Z Davis Filed

9/16/2021: Case Management Statement of Ana Z Davis Filed

Case Management Statement of Harry Hussian Filed

9/27/2021: Case Management Statement of Harry Hussian Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Ana Z Davis

5/13/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Ana Z Davis

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/7/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer - Overruled

1/7/2021: Demurrer - Overruled

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party John Davis Filed

1/15/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party John Davis Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for John Davis

1/26/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for John Davis

Dismissal As to Defendant: John Davis Entered

1/27/2021: Dismissal As to Defendant: John Davis Entered

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Ana Z Davis

2/1/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Ana Z Davis

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

2/1/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Complaint Fraud

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 03/21/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference 03/11/2022 01:30 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 02/14/2022 09:00 AM D- 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/18/2022 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Demurrer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 03/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed by John Davis, Ana Z Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to John Davis Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Ana Z Davis Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/23/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Harry Hussian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBKE, MARK E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWAN, JOHN E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Quan, Andrew Kassouf