Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 18:42:16 (UTC).

Hubbard VS Veritas Health Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Hubbard filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Veritas Health Services, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0436

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUBBARD, CHANDLER

Defendants

ELDREDGE, DENTEN

KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY

KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL

SALMON, TRUDY

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES, INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ARSHAD, ANUM

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

3/3/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chandler Hubbard

3/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chandler Hubbard

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/3/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 07/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

3/5/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/5/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Chandler Hubbard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERITAS HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTH BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant