Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 04:40:17 (UTC).

Howell VS American Standard, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Howell filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against American Standard, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8786

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALES, RICHARD

HOWELL, STEVEN

HOWELL, AMBER

HOWELL FURLONG, DAWN MARIE

Defendants

JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.

COPELAND CORPORATION, LLC

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

THE PEP BOYS- MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

THE MAITOWOC COMPANY, INC.

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

WELBILT, INC.

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

CARRIER CORPORATION

SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, DELAWARE CORPORATION

Others

D'ANGINA, JAMES TERRY

D'ANGINA, ROGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

GAYE, SAMLECIA D.

POND, FRANK D.

CHAVES, MARISA R.

ESTRADA, MICHAEL J.

LOVE, MARK A

SHARP, GARY D.

JAMISON, KEVIN D

OBERG, LISA L.

REEG, ANA T.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference 07/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

5/13/2021: Case Management Conference 07/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Answer to Complaint Filed for The Darcoid Company of California

7/7/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for The Darcoid Company of California

Answer to Complaint Filed for Copeland Corporation, LLC

7/7/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Copeland Corporation, LLC

Answer to Complaint Filed for York International Corporation

6/25/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for York International Corporation

Answer to Complaint Filed for Johnson Controls, Inc.

6/25/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Johnson Controls, Inc.

Answer to Complaint Filed for Genuine Parts Company

6/28/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Genuine Parts Company

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

6/28/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed

6/22/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Service Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Carrier Corporation

6/21/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Carrier Corporation

Notice of Preliminary Fact Sheet Filed

6/2/2021: Notice of Preliminary Fact Sheet Filed

Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

5/24/2021: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

Order INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

5/24/2021: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

5/24/2021: PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

5/24/2021: Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

Complaint Asbestos Filed

5/11/2021: Complaint Asbestos Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/11/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

5/11/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Copeland Corporation, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for The Darcoid Company of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Genuine Parts Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for York International Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Johnson Controls, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Grove U.S, L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Electronic Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 07/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amber Howell

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Welbilt, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant