This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/05/2021 at 00:14:32 (UTC).

Hove VS BB& T Insurance Services of California

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Hove filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BB T Insurance Services of California. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4068

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOVE, CHERYL

Defendants

CRANSTON, JOHN

EPERJESI, CJ

BB& T INSURANCE SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA

ANDERS, JEFF

MCGRIFF INSURANCE SERVVIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AGUIAR, LISA E.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

2/11/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cheryl Hove

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cheryl Hove

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

2/11/2020: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/13/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

2/13/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

6/8/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

6/5/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cheryl Hove

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BB & T BANK 21657 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa E. Aguiar