This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 03:30:53 (UTC).

Horizon Management Group VS Farrell

Case Summary

On 02/04/2005 Horizon Management Group filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Farrell. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELORES CHONG,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7057

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELORES CHONG,

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

HORIZON MANAGEMENT GROUP

Debtor / Appellees and Defendants

FARRELL, ERIC

DONTOGAN, AMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SINGH, PUNEET K.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Horizon Management Group

2/4/2005: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Horizon Management Group

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

2/4/2005: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued

2/7/2005: Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued

Rejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)

10/4/2005: Rejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)

Civil OSC 08/02/2006 10:00 AM D- 504

6/27/2006: Civil OSC 08/02/2006 10:00 AM D- 504

Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed

7/6/2006: Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

7/6/2006: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

7/6/2006: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

Civil OSC Commenced and Continued

8/2/2006: Civil OSC Commenced and Continued

Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

9/22/2006: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

10/4/2006: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

12/14/2006: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed

2/6/2007: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed

Judgment Entered

2/6/2007: Judgment Entered

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • DocketDefault Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2006
  • DocketDefault Entered as to Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan. Judgment Routed to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • DocketMinutes: FTC w/ Local Rules 7.2; Judge: Delores Chong, Pro Tem; Department: Dept 504

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC dept: 504 date: 02/07/2007 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • DocketDefault Entered as to Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan. Judgment Routed to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Eric Farrell, Amy Dontogan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons w/o Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC 08/02/2006 10:00 AM D- 504

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Horizon Management Group

    Read MoreRead Less