This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 09:18:39 (UTC).

Holmbeck VS Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Holmbeck filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Jo-Lynne Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6382

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Jo-Lynne Lee

 

Party Details

Defendants

ITT LLC

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

FMC CORPORATION

BW/IP, INC

ELLIOT COMPANY

IMO INDUSTRIES, INC

GRINNELL LLC

FLOWSERVE US INC

SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC VIACOMBS INC

GARDNER DENVER INC

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

CRANE CO

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

CLA-VAL CO

GOULDS PUMPS INC

WARREN PUMPS LLC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Benno Ashrafi, Esq

Bobbie R. Bailey

Christine D. Calareso

Daniel J. Kelly

Edward Martinovich

Evanthia M Spanos

Frank D. Pond

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/3/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/3/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/25/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/16/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/16/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

4/7/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/5/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Answer

05/26/2022: Answer

Answer

05/23/2022: Answer

Answer

05/20/2022: Answer

Answer

05/20/2022: Answer

Answer

05/20/2022: Answer

Answer

05/18/2022: Answer

Answer

05/17/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

05/18/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

05/18/2022: Answer

168 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Aurora Pump Company (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Warren Pumps LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Warren Pumps LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Flowserve US INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: BW/IP, INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: FMC Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: FMC Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Cla-Val Co (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: IMO Industries, INC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMessage: Preliminary Fact Sheet New Filing- Asbestos Litigation Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMessage: Order RE Designated Defense Counsel Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMessage: Order Initial Case Management Order Asbestos Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 01/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 21; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing 11/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 21; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Depositing Jury Fees Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Theodore Holmbeck; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELLIOT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FMC CORPORATION FKA NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY FKA CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY FKA PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ITT LLC FKA ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BELL & GOSSETT COMPANY FOSTER ENGINEERING COMPANY AND KENNENDY VALVE COMPANY is a litigant