This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/02/2020 at 02:42:06 (UTC).

Hollis R&D Associates, LLC VS Asianmerican Venture Group, LL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 Hollis R D Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Asianmerican Venture Group, LL. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL D. HERBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7221

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL D. HERBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

HOLLIS R&D ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Debtor / Appellees

CARMADO, PAUL

ASIANMERICAN VENTURE GROUP, LLC

LE CLAN ORDINAIRE, LTD

OLSON, KAREN

SRISAWAT, GARY UTID

BUCCI, AMELIA

JULIAN, LESLIE

DEMBLING, CAROL

DEMBLING, ARTHUR

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CARMADO, PAUL

LE CLAN ORDINAIRE, LTD

OLSON, KAREN

BUCCI, AMELIA

JULIAN, LESLIE

DEMBLING, CAROL

DEMBLING, ARTHUR

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

ASIANMERICAN VENTURE GROUP, LLC

SRISAWAT, GARY UTID

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WISEBLOOD, DAVID M.

QUAZZO, MARCO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

9/27/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Judgment Default : Court Filed

9/5/2019: Judgment Default : Court Filed

Judgment Entered

9/5/2019: Judgment Entered

Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

9/5/2019: Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/29/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/29/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Amended Notice of Regarding Evidentiary Hearing to Obtain Default Judgement Against Defendants G. Sr

7/22/2019: Amended Notice of Regarding Evidentiary Hearing to Obtain Default Judgement Against Defendants G. Sr

Proof of Service Amended Notice Regarding Evidentiary Hearing to Obtain Default Judgement Filed

7/22/2019: Proof of Service Amended Notice Regarding Evidentiary Hearing to Obtain Default Judgement Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/12/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Hollis R&D Associates, LLC Filed

6/26/2019: Case Management Statement of Hollis R&D Associates, LLC Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

6/12/2019: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

Notice of Evidentiary Hearing Filed

6/12/2019: Notice of Evidentiary Hearing Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

6/12/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Motion

6/6/2019: Rejection Letter Issued on Motion

Rejection Letter Issued on Motion

5/24/2019: Rejection Letter Issued on Motion

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

5/22/2019: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/22/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Leslie Julian Filed

11/26/2018: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Leslie Julian Filed

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty; Judge: Paul D. Herbert; Department: Dept 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default : Court Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Paul D. Herbert; Department: Dept 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 09/05/2019 09:30 AM D- 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Carol Dembling Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Paul Carmado Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Athur Dembling Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Leslie Julian Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Gary Utid Srisawat Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/19/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hollis R&D Associates, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUAZZO, MARCO