This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 21:26:15 (UTC).

HODGSON VS TON

Case Summary

On 03/27/1998 HODGSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TON. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREMONT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8488

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

FREMONT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

HODGSON, MYRTLE R

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

TON, SAO

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

5/4/1998: Proof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

5/7/1998: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Ruling Taken Under Submission

5/7/1998: Ruling Taken Under Submission

Judgment Entered

5/14/1998: Judgment Entered

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/1998
  • DocketClaim of Defendant Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/1998
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Fremont Judge Pro Tem; Department: Dept 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/1998
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Defendant Valid As to MYRTLE R HODGSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/1998
  • DocketCLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/1998
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 05/07/1998 08:30:00 AM D-6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/1998
  • DocketCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF, ORDER ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less