This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 15:16:10 (UTC).

Herring VS Casa Sandoval, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Herring filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Casa Sandoval, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES REILLY and HON. James Reilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6101

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES REILLY

HON. James Reilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERRING , MURIEL

HERRING, MURIEL

HUNTER, ROBERTA

Muriel Herring

Roberta Hunter

Cross Defendants and Defendants

HAYWARD SENIOR HOUSING I OPCO LLC

GAZON, PAUL

HAYWARD SENIOR HOUSING I JV OPCO, LLC

MORNINGSTAR SENIOR MANAGEMENT, LLC

CASA SANDOVAL, LLC

KAREP V SENIOR HOUSING REOC JV, LLC

Kayne Anderson Capital Advisors

Paul Gazon

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CASA SANDOVAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GARCIA, STEPHEN M

JACOBSON, REUBEN B.

FEUSNER, JODIE C.

WEST, MICHAEL P

Jodie C. Feusner

Michael Paul West

Reuben B. Jacobson

Stephen Michael Garcia

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/8/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/28/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/29/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/18/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/16/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of of Case Management Conference Filed

11/30/2020: Notice of of Case Management Conference Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 02/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

10/13/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 02/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

General Order (Court Order)

05/23/2022: General Order (Court Order)

Order re: Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR LIMIT DEFENDANT CASA SANDOVAL, LLC’S BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENAS SERVED UPON VARIOUS HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SUPPORTING DECLARATION

05/18/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR LIMIT DEFENDANT CASA SANDOVAL, LLC’S BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENAS SERVED UPON VARIOUS HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SUPPORTING DECLARATION

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR LIMIT DEFEN...)

05/18/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR LIMIT DEFEN...)

Separate Statement

05/17/2022: Separate Statement

Declaration In Support of Motion to Compel Deposition

05/17/2022: Declaration In Support of Motion to Compel Deposition

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

05/17/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum for Business Records

05/09/2022: Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum for Business Records

Opposition DEFENDANTS MORNINGSTAR SENIOR MANAGEMENT, LLC, HAYWARD SENIOR HOUSING I OPCO, LLC, HAYWARD SENIOR HOUSING I JV OPCO, LLC, PAUL GAZON, and KAYNE ANDERSON CAPITAL ADVISORS, LPs OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPOI

05/06/2022: Opposition DEFENDANTS MORNINGSTAR SENIOR MANAGEMENT, LLC, HAYWARD SENIOR HOUSING I OPCO, LLC, HAYWARD SENIOR HOUSING I JV OPCO, LLC, PAUL GAZON, and KAYNE ANDERSON CAPITAL ADVISORS, LPs OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVER

Answer

05/06/2022: Answer

279 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Court Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR LIMIT DEFENDANT CASA SANDOVAL, LLCS BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENAS SERVED UPON VARIOUS HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SUPPORTING DECLARATION scheduled for 05/18/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/22/2022 03:00 PM; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR LIMIT DEFENDANT CASA SANDOVAL, LLCS BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENAS SERVED UPON VARIOUS HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SUPPORTING DECLARATION scheduled for 06/22/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR LIMIT DEFENDANT CASA SANDOVAL, LLCS BUSINESS RECORDS SUBPOENAS SERVED UPON VARIOUS HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SUPPORTING DECLARATION Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR LIMIT DEFEN...); Category: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion - Other MTC PMK Deposition scheduled for 09/28/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMessage: Separate Statement Filed by: Muriel Herring (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration In Support of Motion to Compel Deposition Filed by: Muriel Herring (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMessage: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Filed by: Muriel Herring (Plaintiff) As to: Hayward Senior Housing I Opco LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Michael Paul West (Attorney):Name Suffix: blankMiddle Name changed from P to Paul; Category: Party

    Read MoreRead Less
261 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMessage: Motion for Preference Hearing Confirmed for 01/13/2021 09:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMessage: Motion for Preference Filed by Muriel Herring; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Morningstar Senior Management, LLC Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other As to Hayward Senior Housing I Opco LLC Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other As to Hayward Senior Housing I JV Opco, LLC Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 02/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Muriel Herring; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORNINGSTAR SENIOR MANAGEMENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KAYNE ANDERSON CAPITAL ADVISORS L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUSNER, JODIE C.