This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 02:32:33 (UTC).

Hernandez VS St. Rose Hospital, a corporation

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Hernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against St Rose Hospital, a corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT MCGUINESS and JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4956

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT MCGUINESS

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ, GLORIA

Defendants

CEBRERO, TAIDE

ST. ROSE HOSPITAL, A CORPORATION

ST. ROSE HOSPITAL FOUNDATION

HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JACOBS, ELANA R.

MORONEY, LINDA M

VARLACK, TIEGA-NOEL

 

Court Documents

Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

5/1/2020: Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

5/15/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

11/5/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Hayward Sisters Hospital

8/21/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Hayward Sisters Hospital

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gloria Hernandez Filed

7/26/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gloria Hernandez Filed

Order Allowing Substitution of True Name for Doe Filed

6/7/2019: Order Allowing Substitution of True Name for Doe Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/14/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/14/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

5/16/2019: Stipulation Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party St. Rose Hospital Foundation Filed

5/16/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party St. Rose Hospital Foundation Filed

Case Management Statement of St. Rose Hospital Foundation Filed

4/29/2019: Case Management Statement of St. Rose Hospital Foundation Filed

Case Management Statement of Gloria Hernandez Filed

4/29/2019: Case Management Statement of Gloria Hernandez Filed

Case Management Statement of Taide Cebrero Filed

5/1/2019: Case Management Statement of Taide Cebrero Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Taide Cebrero

4/12/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Taide Cebrero

Answer to Complaint Filed for Taide Cebrero

4/2/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Taide Cebrero

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Taide Cebrero Filed

3/11/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Taide Cebrero Filed

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 04/21/2020 09:00 AM D- 303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 05/08/2020 08:30 AM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/08/2020 01:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 04/07/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Filed for Gloria Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Employment As to St. Rose Hospital, a corporation Fil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Employment As to St. Rose Hospital Foundation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/11/2019 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gloria Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. ROSE HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacobs, Elana R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moroney, Linda Moin