This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 15:12:46 (UTC).

Hernandez VS Aisin Holdings of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Hernandez filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Aisin Holdings of America, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2984

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blanca Hernandez

Defendants

AISIN HOLDINGS OF AMERICA, INC.

AISIN SEIKI CO., LTD

AUTOMOTIVE EXCHANGE SERVICE, INC.

EPE, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

NEW UNITED MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INC.

TOYOTA MOTOR MANUFACTURING, KENTUCY, INC.

TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC.

TOYOTA MOTORS SALES, U.S.A., INC.

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

AKEBONO BRAKE CORPORATION

AISIN CORPORATION, F/K/A AISIN SEIKI CO., LTD.

AISIN HOLDINGS OF AMERICA, INC., formerly known as AISIN U.S.A., INC.

AKEBONO BRAKE INDUSTRY CO., LTD.

FEDERAL-MOGUL BREMSBELAG GmbH, fka HONEYWELL BREMSBELAG GmbH and JURID WERKE GmbH

Not Yet Classified

DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Christopher D. Strunk

Constance Fraenkel, Esq

Craig L Hodgson

David R Ongaro

Dean A. Olson

Edward Eldon Hartley

Edward M Slaughter

Joseph D Satterley, Esq

Kimberly I. Chew

Viiu Spangler Khare

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/20/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/17/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

6/30/2021: Case Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

General Order (Case Management Order)

05/24/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)

Declaration DECLARATION OF DIRK BERNHARDT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DESTRUCTIVE TESTING AND PATHOLOGY

05/20/2022: Declaration DECLARATION OF DIRK BERNHARDT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DESTRUCTIVE TESTING AND PATHOLOGY

Opposition Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Protective Order

05/20/2022: Opposition Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Protective Order

Reply DEFENDANTS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/20/2022: Reply DEFENDANTS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FRAUD IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/20/2022: Reply DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FRAUD IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES

05/20/2022: Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/20/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

05/20/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order re Destructive Testing and Pathology

05/20/2022: Declaration Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order re Destructive Testing and Pathology

Opposition Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order re Destructive Testing and Pathology

05/20/2022: Opposition Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order re Destructive Testing and Pathology

Stipulation and Order DEFENDANTS STIPULATION TO HAVE DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE HEARD ON JUNE 3, 2022 AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

05/18/2022: Stipulation and Order DEFENDANTS STIPULATION TO HAVE DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE HEARD ON JUNE 3, 2022 AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Declaration Declaration of Michael T. Stewart

05/17/2022: Declaration Declaration of Michael T. Stewart

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

05/17/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

05/17/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

397 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/26/2022 09:00 AM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration DECLARATION OF DIRK BERNHARDT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DESTRUCTIVE TESTING AND PATHOLOGY Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Opposition Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Protective Order Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Reply DEFENDANTS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Reply DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FOR FRAUD IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL T. STEWART IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES Filed by: Raul Hernandez (Plaintiff); Blanca Hernandez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Raul Hernandez (Plaintiff); Blanca Hernandez (Plaintiff) As to: Aisin Holdings of America, Inc. (Defendant); Aisin Seiki Co., LTD (Defendant); Akebono Brake Corporation (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Raul Hernandez (Plaintiff); Blanca Hernandez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
428 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order - INITIAL CASE MANAGMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 08/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 18; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to EPE, Inc. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Toyota Motor North America, Inc. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Demand for Trial by Jury, and Estimate of Length of Trial Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Raul Hernandez; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less