This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/28/2020 at 16:10:13 (UTC).

Heredia VS Marti

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 Heredia filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Marti. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TAMIZA HOCKENHULL, BENTRISH A SATARZADEH and BENTRISH SATARZADEH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3069

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

TAMIZA HOCKENHULL

BENTRISH A SATARZADEH

BENTRISH SATARZADEH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERRERA, ALEJANDRO

HEREDIA, ALEJANDRO

Defendant

MARTI, TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

3/13/2020: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

2/18/2020: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

2/26/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

2/26/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

1/17/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

12/17/2019: Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed

Motion: for Joinder to Reclassify from Small Claims to Limited Jurisdiction Filed

12/20/2019: Motion: for Joinder to Reclassify from Small Claims to Limited Jurisdiction Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

1/17/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/17/2020: Small Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Postponement Filed for Alejandro Heredia

12/5/2019: Request Re: Postponement Filed for Alejandro Heredia

Request Re: Postponement Granted

12/10/2019: Request Re: Postponement Granted

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

10/1/2019: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

9/25/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

9/25/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/15/2019: Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Request to Postpone Filed

4/15/2019: Request to Postpone Filed

Stipulation for Commissioner to Sit as Temporary Judge for All Purposes Filed

3/25/2019: Stipulation for Commissioner to Sit as Temporary Judge for All Purposes Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

12/20/2018: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Minute Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Minute Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Minute Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion: for Joinder to Reclassify from Small Claims to Limited Jurisdiction; Judge: Bentrish Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMotion: for Joinder to Reclassify from Small Claims to Limited Jurisdiction Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/27/2019 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/27/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner to Sit as Temporary Judge for All Purposes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 04/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 03/25/2019 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/25/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less