This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 06:24:00 (UTC).

Henkes VS Telsa Energy, Inc

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Henkes filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Telsa Energy, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0233

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENKES, STEVEN

Defendants

TELSA ENERGY, INC

TELSA ENERGY OPERATIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WALLACE, ROBERT F.

OCHS, DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/23/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/24/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

11/23/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 03/24/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/18/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/23/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

3/23/2021: Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed

3/11/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed

Reply Brief in Support of Motion Motion to Compel Arbritration Filed

3/16/2021: Reply Brief in Support of Motion Motion to Compel Arbritration Filed

Case Management Statement of Steven Henkes Filed

3/4/2021: Case Management Statement of Steven Henkes Filed

Proof of Service Filed

3/4/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Case Management Statement of Telsa Energy Operations, Inc. Filed

3/9/2021: Case Management Statement of Telsa Energy Operations, Inc. Filed

Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

2/3/2021: Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

Answer to Complaint Filed for Telsa Energy, Inc

1/6/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Telsa Energy, Inc

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

12/30/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Hearing Reset to Motion to Compel (Motion) 03/23/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

12/31/2020: Hearing Reset to Motion to Compel (Motion) 03/23/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Steven Henkes

12/10/2020: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Steven Henkes

Proof of Service 170.6 Challenge Filed

12/10/2020: Proof of Service 170.6 Challenge Filed

Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Granted

12/16/2020: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Granted

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Compel (Motion); Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/23/2022 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Brief in Support of Motion Motion to Compel Arbritration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Reservation Set for dept: 514 date: 02/09/2021 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Steven Henkes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service 170.6 Challenge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/24/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Steven Henkes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLACE, ROBERT F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OCHS, DANIELLE