This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 06:22:54 (UTC).

Hemant VS McFarlane

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 Hemant filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against McFarlane. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. James Reilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6095

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. James Reilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hemant Hemant

Defendants

David McFarlane

Regina Mann-McFarlane

does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Jerome P Bellotti, ESQ

Mark R. Carbone

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/1/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/25/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Initial Case Management Conference 09/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

4/21/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

General Order (Case Management Order)

05/23/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)

Case Management Statement

05/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/09/2022: Case Management Statement

General Order (Case Management Order)

04/01/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)

Case Management Statement

04/01/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Order re: Compliance Hearing

02/03/2022: Order re: Compliance Hearing

Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

02/03/2022: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

11/12/2021: Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Notice of Hearing

11/12/2021: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Settlement

11/12/2021: Notice of Settlement

Declaration of Service by Mail

09/01/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney Filed

09/21/2021: Notice of Change in Handling Attorney Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

09/01/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/30/2022 03:00 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 08/30/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Hemant Hemant (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: David McFarlane (Defendant); Regina Mann-McFarlane (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/24/2022 03:00 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: David McFarlane (Defendant); Regina Mann-McFarlane (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Hemant Hemant (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for David McFarlane, Regina Mann-McFarlane; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Regina Mann-McFarlane Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to David McFarlane Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 09/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of posting of jury fees Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hemant Hemant; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less