This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/23/2020 at 02:40:16 (UTC).

Helmuth VS Leung

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Helmuth filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Leung. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JENNA WHITMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2589

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JENNA WHITMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

HELMUTH, MARSHA

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

LEUNG, GABE

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

1/29/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

12/26/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

12/26/2019: Judgment Entered

Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

11/19/2019: Certified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/8/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 12/26/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Marsha Helmuth Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail Return Receipt with Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver Hearing - SC 12/04/2019 09:30 AM D- FHO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Hearing Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Marsha Helmuth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 12/26/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less