This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 06:42:42 (UTC).

Helberg VS Amcord, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Helberg filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Amcord, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN KAUS and JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6919

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEPHEN KAUS

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HELBERG, LEON R.

HELBERG, KRISTINE A.

Defendants

MANNINGTON MILLS, INC.

THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, LP

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

BOSTIK, INC.

MISSION STUCCO COMPANY

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

DAP, INC.

SOCO WEST, INC.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS, INC.

AMCORD, INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC.

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD

PAREX USA, INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

CALPORTLAND COMPANY

JAMES HARDIE BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

UCHIMURA, MARISSA Y.

FRIEND, MOLLY A

SHARP, GARY D.

RIDLEY, SHAWN M.

KARREN, BRENT M.

SPANGLER, VIJU C

TINKOFF, SHELLEY K

RUIZ, FERLIN P.

DUFFY, JOSEPH

BERKES, ROBERT H.

LEE, JENNIFER J

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J

LOVE, MARK A

ADAMS, BARBARA R

MCCLAIN, FLORENCE A

LAZARUS ESQ, LISA H

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

FOUNTAIN, BILL D.

GLASPY, DAVID M

BUTY, MADELINE L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/4/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/4/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

11/30/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 09/18/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

6/6/2018: Case Management Conference 09/18/2018 03:00 PM D- 23

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 09/18/2018 09:00 AM D- 17

7/11/2018: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 09/18/2018 09:00 AM D- 17

Notice of of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgement Filed

12/10/2020: Notice of of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgement Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party James Hardie Building Products, Inc. File

12/10/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party James Hardie Building Products, Inc. File

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party The W.W. Henry Company, LP Filed

12/10/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party The W.W. Henry Company, LP Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Dap, Inc. Filed

12/10/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Dap, Inc. Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Mannington Mills, Inc. Filed

12/14/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Mannington Mills, Inc. Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party

2/2/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

4/1/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

4/6/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Domco Products Texas, Inc. Filed

9/25/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Domco Products Texas, Inc. Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party American Biltrite, Inc. Filed

9/29/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party American Biltrite, Inc. Filed

Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Mannington Mills, Inc.

10/2/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Filed by Mannington Mills, Inc.

Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Dap, Inc.

10/2/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Dap, Inc.

Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for James Hardie Building Products, Inc.

10/2/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for James Hardie Building Products, Inc.

151 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 12/18/2020 time: 10:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Mannington Mills, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Mannington Mills, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Dap, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: The W.W. Henry Company, LP Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party The W.W. Henry Company, LP Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: James Hardie Building Products, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Re Designated Defense Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Preliminary Fact Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder re Case Management Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Leon R. Helberg

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOSTIK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JAMES HARDIE BUILDING PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MANNINGTON MILLS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MISSION STUCCO CO. is a litigant