This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 03:05:29 (UTC).

HDI Global Specialty SE VS Evanston Insurance

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 HDI Global Specialty SE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Evanston Insurance. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EVELIO GRILLO, BRAD SELIGMAN and WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2747

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

EVELIO GRILLO

BRAD SELIGMAN

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE

Defendants

NATIONWIDE AMCO INSURANCE

UNITED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE

EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS

ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE

DINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE

FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE

EVANSTON INSURANCE

STEADFAST INSURANCE

ILLINOIS UNION INSURANCE

CENTURY SURETY GROUP

QBE NORTH AMERICA

NORTH AMERICAN CAPACITY INSURANCE

LEXINGTON INSURANCE NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY

FEDERAL INSURANCE

ZURICH NORTH AMERICA

DELOS INSURANCE

GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DELAPENA, GREGORY R

LAWRENCE, CYNTHIA

ELOWSKY, JENNIFER L.

LEAHY, MICHAEL J

EZRA, DAVID B.

ZLOTLOW, JOSHUA A.

CURET, BLAISE S.

MORALES, RAMIRO

CASTORIA, LOUIS

LEICHENGER, SHERYL W

MIXER, MELISSA K.

ROBERTSON, LES W.

QUINTERO, JARIA S

BARTLETT, MICHAEL

AGNESS, AARON C

BARBER, BRYAN M

STEPHAN, GREGORY D

MCCLOSKEY, ANDREW R

ROBERTSON, LESLEY W.

DOWNS, ANDREW B

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/28/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/28/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/10/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/29/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/29/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/4/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/1/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Illinois Union Insurance Company, Federal

9/21/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Illinois Union Insurance Company, Federal

Case Management Statement of Evanston Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Gemini Ins

9/21/2021: Case Management Statement of Evanston Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Gemini Ins

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Burlington Insurance Company Filed

8/18/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Burlington Insurance Company Filed

Attendance Sheet Filed

8/13/2021: Attendance Sheet Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/11/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Change of Address Filed

6/18/2021: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

8/4/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

8/4/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Consent to Electronic Service & Notice of Electronic Service Address Filed

6/9/2021: Consent to Electronic Service & Notice of Electronic Service Address Filed

156 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 12/01/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Evanston Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Gemini Ins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, ACE American

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Illinois Union Insurance Company, Federal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Burlington Insurance Company Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Burlington Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
179 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Lexington Insurance Navigators Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Preferred Contractor Insurance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to First Mercury Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 09/15/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 08/11/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for HDI Global Specialty SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Insurance Coverage Claims (from Complex Case) Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QBE NORTH AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED CONTRACTORS INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where DELOS INSURANCE is a litigant