This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 09:05:52 (UTC).

Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company VS Lightle

Case Summary

On 07/18/1997 Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lightle. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACQUELINE TABER and TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4533

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACQUELINE TABER

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendants

LIGHTLE, JAMES

URCH, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TAGLIARINI, THOMAS C

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

5/3/1999: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

4/19/1999: Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

4/2/1999: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Hearing Reset to Civil OSC - Complaints 04/02/1999 02:00 PM D- S-65

3/1/1999: Hearing Reset to Civil OSC - Complaints 04/02/1999 02:00 PM D- S-65

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

12/29/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

11/9/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Civil OSC - Complaints 11/09/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

10/8/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints 11/09/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

Complaint Subrogation Filed

7/18/1997: Complaint Subrogation Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/1999
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1999
  • DocketMinutes: FTC w/ Local Rules 5.0; Judge: Jacqueline Taber; Department: Dept S-65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1999
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: S-65 date: 05/03/1999 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1999
  • DocketSanctions Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil OSC - Complaints 04/02/1999 02:00 PM D- S-65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/1998
  • DocketMinutes: FTC w/ Local Rules 5.0; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 03/09/1999 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/1998
  • DocketSanctions Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/1998
  • DocketMinutes: FTC w/ Local Rules 5.0; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 12/29/1998 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/1998
  • DocketSanctions Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 11/09/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/1997
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/1997
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Subrogation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less