This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 20:01:04 (UTC).

Harris VS Levi Strauss & Co.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Harris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Levi Strauss Co. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. James Reilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5452

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. James Reilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS, NENNETTE

Nennette Harris

Defendants

LEVI STRAUSS & CO.

LIVERMORE PREMIUM OUTLETS, LLC

UNKNOWN, AMANDA

Amanda unknown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AZIZI, DANIEL

Daniel Azizi

Kevin D. Smith

Stephen Pelletier

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

7/19/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Case Management Order

03/24/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

03/24/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

03/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/08/2022: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

03/02/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

12/21/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/15/2021: Answer

Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

11/29/2021: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

11/29/2021: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

Proof of Personal Service

12/02/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

11/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

11/03/2021: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

07/19/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

07/19/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

07/16/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/24/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 303; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 11/17/2023 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Jury Trial scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Nennette Harris (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Levi Strauss & Co. (Defendant); Livermore Premium Outlets, LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Kevin D. Smith (Attorney):First Name changed from KEVIN to KevinLast Name changed from SMITH to SmithOrganization Name: Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP; Category: Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMessage: Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Livermore Premium Outlets, LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Nennette Harris (Plaintiff) As to: Livermore Premium Outlets, LLC (Defendant) Service Date: 11/15/2021 Service Cost: 110.00 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Nennette Harris (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: On the Court's own motion, Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/29/2021 03:00 PM; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 25; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Nennette Harris; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIVERMORE PREMIUM OUTLETS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEVI STRAUSS & CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pelletier, Stephen Thomas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AZIZI, DANIEL