Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 12:40:55 (UTC).

Harris VS Acre Designs, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Harris filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Acre Designs, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0828

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS, JENNA STATFELD

HARRIS, AARON

Defendants

ACRE DESIGNS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DICKSON, ANDREW B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HOFFMAN, JASON L.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/11/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/8/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/8/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

9/24/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Case Management Statement of Aaron Harris, Jenna Statfeld Harris Filed

2/3/2021: Case Management Statement of Aaron Harris, Jenna Statfeld Harris Filed

Proof of Publication As to Acre Designs, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Andrew B. Dickson Filed

2/4/2021: Proof of Publication As to Acre Designs, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Andrew B. Dickson Filed

Proof of Publication As to Acre Designs, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Andrew B. Dickson Filed

1/21/2021: Proof of Publication As to Acre Designs, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Andrew B. Dickson Filed

Order After Ex Parte Application for Publication of Summons to Publish Filed

12/16/2020: Order After Ex Parte Application for Publication of Summons to Publish Filed

Case Management Statement of Aaron Harris, Jenna Statfeld Harris Filed

12/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Aaron Harris, Jenna Statfeld Harris Filed

Proposed Order Received

11/18/2020: Proposed Order Received

Complaint Fraud Filed

5/12/2020: Complaint Fraud Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/12/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

5/14/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 09/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/14/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Aaron Harris, Jenna Statfeld Harris Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/22/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication As to Acre Designs, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Andrew B. Dickson Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Aaron Harris, Jenna Statfeld Harris Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/12/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Aaron Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACRE DESIGNS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFMAN, JASON L.