This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/15/2020 at 03:11:35 (UTC).

Hanna VS JCPenney Properties,Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2018 Hanna filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JCPenney Properties,Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONNI MACLAREN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9090

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONNI MACLAREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNA , EVELIA

Defendants

FARALLON CAPITAL MANAGEMENT (GP),LLC

JCPENNEY PROPERTIES,INC.

SIMON PROPERTY GROUP,INC.

KELLERMEYER BERGENSONS SERVICES,LLC

CBRE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCCUSKER, BRINTON R.

JACOBSEN, KAREN L

GILLE, RYAN

NOEL, MATTHEW P.

SUMNER, SCOTT H.Z.

HAMANT, CANDICE N.

ROTH, DAVID V.

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 10/30/2018 09:00 AM D- 25

6/19/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 10/30/2018 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

11/12/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed

10/10/2019: Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed

Case Management Statement of CBRE, INC. Filed

10/17/2019: Case Management Statement of CBRE, INC. Filed

Case Management Statement of Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC Filed

10/17/2019: Case Management Statement of Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC Filed

Case Management Statement of JCPenney Properties,Inc. Filed

10/23/2019: Case Management Statement of JCPenney Properties,Inc. Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

10/25/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Settlement Conference Statement of Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC Filed

9/16/2019: Settlement Conference Statement of Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC Filed

Notice of Settlement Filed for Evelia Hanna

9/19/2019: Notice of Settlement Filed for Evelia Hanna

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/23/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Rejection Letter Issued on Motion for Summary Judgment

7/8/2019: Rejection Letter Issued on Motion for Summary Judgment

Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC

7/8/2019: Application Re: Order Shortening Time Filed for Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

7/8/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Objection To Def Ex Parte Filed

7/9/2019: Objection To Def Ex Parte Filed

Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC

7/10/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

7/10/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted

7/10/2019: Application Re: Order Shortening Time Granted

Notice of Change of Address Filed

7/23/2019: Notice of Change of Address Filed

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of JCPenney Properties,Inc. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of CBRE, INC. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Case Management Order Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 10/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 10/21/2019 09:30 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/07/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for JCPenney Properties,Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Simon Property Group,Inc. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kellermeyer Bergensons Services,LLC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to JCPenney Properties,Inc. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/30/2018 09:00 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Evelia Hanna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (Amended)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARALLON CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CBRE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where KELLERMEYER BERGENSONS SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Simon Property Goup LP is a litigant