Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 20:35:31 (UTC).

Haniff VS Sprague

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Haniff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sprague. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3881

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANIFF, MUHSIN

Defendant

SPRAGUE, JERRY LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WOODHEAD, GREG R.

HONEY, R JASON

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/24/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/24/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Muhsin Haniff Filed

6/10/2020: Case Management Statement of Muhsin Haniff Filed

Notice of Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

6/10/2020: Notice of Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint - Auto Tort As to Jerry Lynn Sprague Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint - Auto Tort As to Jerry Lynn Sprague Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Jerry Lynn Sprague

5/14/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Jerry Lynn Sprague

Summons Issued and Filed

2/24/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

2/24/2020: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

Initial Case Management Conference 06/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

2/11/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/11/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

2/10/2020: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Muhsin Haniff

2/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Muhsin Haniff

Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Muhsin Haniff

2/10/2020: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Muhsin Haniff

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Status re: ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketPretrial Conference 04/16/2021 10:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 03/05/2021 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 04/26/2021 09:30 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Muhsin Haniff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Jerry Lynn Sprague

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint - Auto Tort As to Jerry Lynn Sprague Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Muhsin Haniff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Muhsin Haniff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HONEY, R JASON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Woodhead, Greg R