This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 00:56:47 (UTC).

Hajian VS Gilherrera

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Hajian filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gilherrera. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8318

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAJIAN, SHOLEH

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GILHERRERA, RUBEN ANGEL

VALDEZ, MARK J

CARDENAS, LORENA GUTIERREZ

HAJIAN, YAZDON FARD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

VALDEZ, MARK J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WEBSTER, FREDERIC L.

O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.

WALSH, DANIEL C

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/27/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/11/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/26/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Motion to Deny Good Faith Application Denied

4/6/2021: Motion to Deny Good Faith Application Denied

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Mark J Valdez Rejected

3/1/2021: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Mark J Valdez Rejected

Case Management Statement of Sholeh Hajian Filed

1/19/2021: Case Management Statement of Sholeh Hajian Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/27/2021: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of Pltff's Failure to Timely file and serve response to Motion to compel responses to Deft 's

9/25/2020: Notice of Pltff's Failure to Timely file and serve response to Motion to compel responses to Deft 's

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Ruben Angel Gilherrera

5/11/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Ruben Angel Gilherrera

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/15/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/15/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/14/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Sholeh Hajian Filed

11/12/2019: Case Management Statement of Sholeh Hajian Filed

Declaration re: Response to OSC Filed

11/12/2019: Declaration re: Response to OSC Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/18/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/9/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

2/26/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Good Faith Settlement Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Deny Good Faith Application Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Deny Good Faith Application; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Deny Good Faith Application Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Brief in Support of Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Media Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Opposition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Mark J Valdez Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/18/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Sholeh Hajian Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/15/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sholeh Hajian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEBSTER, FREDERIC L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'NEAL, JEFFREY F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL C. WALSH