This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 14:29:32 (UTC).

Hackworth VS Giles

Case Summary

On 04/23/1999 Hackworth filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Giles. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARLENE KOCK, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5030

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

ARLENE KOCK, PORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HACKWORTH, ADIE

Defendant

GILES, MARILYN

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/23/1999: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

5/24/1999: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

5/24/1999: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

6/7/1999: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

6/7/1999: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

6/7/1999: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/1999
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Arlene Kock, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/1999
  • DocketMediation Agreement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/1999
  • DocketAgreement to Participate in Confidential Mediation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/1999
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to Marilyn Giles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/1999
  • Docket* ALL DEPARTMENT NUMBERS CHANGED DUE TO UNIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/1999
  • Docket* Small Claims Court Trial 06/07/1999 02:00 PM D- 2 [*D-702]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/1999
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less