This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/21/2020 at 23:49:18 (UTC).

Ha VS Estrada

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Ha filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Estrada. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4594

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAM, VI

HA, YEB

HA, YEN

Defendants

ESTRADA, JANETTE

ESTRADA, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LARSEN, BRIAN L.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/19/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada Filed

8/3/2020: Case Management Statement of Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada Filed

Case Management Statement of Yen Ha Filed

8/10/2020: Case Management Statement of Yen Ha Filed

Case Management Statement of Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada Filed

6/11/2020: Case Management Statement of Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada Filed

Case Management Statement of Yen Ha Filed

6/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Yen Ha Filed

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

6/8/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maria Estrada Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Maria Estrada Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Janette Estrada Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Janette Estrada Filed

Notice of Demand for Jury And Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

5/11/2020: Notice of Demand for Jury And Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada

5/11/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada

Initial Case Management Conference 06/29/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

2/19/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/29/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/19/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/14/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yeb Ha

2/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yeb Ha

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

2/14/2020: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/17/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Yen Ha Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Yen Ha Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Janette Estrada Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Janette Estrada, Maria Estrada

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Maria Estrada Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Demand for Jury And Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/29/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yeb Ha

    Read MoreRead Less