This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 12:29:03 (UTC).

Gutierrez VS La Clinica De La Raza, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Gutierrez filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against La Clinica De La Raza, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN and HON. Brad Seligman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0781

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

HON. Brad Seligman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUTIERREZ, MARITZA

Maritza Gutierrez

Defendant

LA CLINICA DE LA RAZA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ALWAZIAN, EDWIN

MEREDITH, NICOLE L

WANG, SHIRLEY

Edwin Alwazian

Nicole L Meredith

Shirley Wang

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/14/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/14/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/13/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/10/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/27/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/27/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/23/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/15/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Joint Status Conference Statement

05/23/2022: Joint Status Conference Statement

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

04/20/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Declaration Declaration of Aram Boyadjian in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte

04/18/2022: Declaration Declaration of Aram Boyadjian in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte

Order Proposed Order

04/19/2022: Order Proposed Order

Declaration Declaration of Tara Zabehi in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte

04/18/2022: Declaration Declaration of Tara Zabehi in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte

Proof of Service by Mail

04/18/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to file Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

04/18/2022: Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to file Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

04/13/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice Defendant La Clinical De La Raza's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

03/23/2022: Notice Defendant La Clinical De La Raza's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

185 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMessage: Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by: Maritza Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Issued and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order Proposed Order Signed and Filed by: Maritza Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to file Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification: Result: Granted Result Date: 04/19/2022; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Declaration of Aram Boyadjian in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Filed by: Maritza Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Declaration of Tara Zabehi in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Filed by: Maritza Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed by: Maritza Gutierrez (Plaintiff) As to: La Clinica De La Raza, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Ex Parte Application Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order continuing Plaintiff's Deadline to file Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Filed by: Maritza Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: La Clinica De La Raza, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice Defendant La Clinical De La Raza's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed by: La Clinica De La Raza, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Continued to Complex Determination Hearing dept: 23 date: 05/14/2019 time: 03:00 PM; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled; Category: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued; Category: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 05/28/2019 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing 04/23/2019 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maritza Gutierrez; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Employment Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where La Clinica De La Raza is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WANG, SHIRLEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEREDITH, NICOLE L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN