Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/10/2020 at 12:41:09 (UTC).

Guo VS Leung

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 Guo filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against Leung. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2262

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZHENG, SIMIN

ZHENG, HAI LONG

GUO, XIAN HONG

LIANG, SHAO ZHEN

Defendants

LI, GUO HAO

LEUNG, JAMES

LEUNG, SHING YIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RAVESCROFT, JACQUELINE

CRANE, ALISON M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/14/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

5/22/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/22/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

5/22/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Extend the Private Mediation Completion Deadline

12/11/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Extend the Private Mediation Completion Deadline

Order Extension of Time Filed

12/12/2019: Order Extension of Time Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

1/9/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

7/26/2019: Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

Case Management Statement of James Leung, Shing Yip Leung, Guo Hao Li Filed

5/6/2019: Case Management Statement of James Leung, Shing Yip Leung, Guo Hao Li Filed

Case Management Statement of Xian Hong Guo, Shao Zhen Liang, Hai Long Zheng, Simin Zheng Filed

5/10/2019: Case Management Statement of Xian Hong Guo, Shao Zhen Liang, Hai Long Zheng, Simin Zheng Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/24/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for James Leung, Shing Yip Leung, Guo Hao Li

3/4/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for James Leung, Shing Yip Leung, Guo Hao Li

Initial Case Management Conference 05/28/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

1/14/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 05/28/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/14/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

1/11/2019: Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 25 date: 08/11/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/11/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Pretrial Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/14/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/18/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Xian Hong Guo, Shao Zhen Liang, Hai Long Zheng, Simin Zheng Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of James Leung, Shing Yip Leung, Guo Hao Li Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for James Leung, Shing Yip Leung, Guo Hao Li

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/28/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Xian Hong Guo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANE, ALISON M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAVENSCROFT, JACQUELINE