Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/15/2021 at 02:31:07 (UTC).

Guillen VS Cen Cal Plastering, Inc., a California Corporatio

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Guillen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Cen Cal Plastering, Inc , a California Corporatio. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0680

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUILLEN, GEORGIE MAY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ROBLES, CAROLYN

CEN CAL PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GONZALES, LEONARDO FLORES

FOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GOMERMAN, TANYA

DALEY, MICHAEL J.

HAR, BRIAN J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/30/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/16/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/16/2020 09:01 AM D- 24

10/6/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 10/16/2020 09:01 AM D- 24

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

8/31/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Georgie May Guillen Filed

6/25/2020: Case Management Statement of Georgie May Guillen Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Declaration in Response to Declaration Re: Informal Discovery Conference Filed

1/15/2020: Declaration in Response to Declaration Re: Informal Discovery Conference Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Carolyn Robles

9/25/2019: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Carolyn Robles

Case Management Statement of Georgie May Guillen Filed

10/2/2019: Case Management Statement of Georgie May Guillen Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Carolyn Robles

9/25/2019: Cross-Complaint Filed for Carolyn Robles

Case Management Statement of Carolyn Robles Filed

9/25/2019: Case Management Statement of Carolyn Robles Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Cen Cal Plastering, Inc., a California Corporation, Leonardo Flores Gonzal

9/18/2019: Cross-Complaint Filed for Cen Cal Plastering, Inc., a California Corporation, Leonardo Flores Gonzal

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Carolyn Robles Filed

7/19/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Carolyn Robles Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cen Cal Plastering, Inc., a California Corporation Filed

6/20/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cen Cal Plastering, Inc., a California Corporation Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/28/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/30/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: ADR; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 10/30/2020 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Cen Cal Plastering, Inc., a California Corporation, Leonardo Flores Go

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Leonardo Flores Gonzales Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Carolyn Robles Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Carolyn Robles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Cen Cal Plastering, Inc., a California Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Georgie May Guillen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cen-Cal Plastering, Inc., a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAR, BRIAN J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALEY, MICHAEL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOMERMAN, TANYA