Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 13:55:11 (UTC).

Guardianship of Johnna Claire King

Case Summary

On 08/25/2003 Guardianship of Johnna Claire King was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEITH FUDENNA, CARL W. MORRIS and BART SCHENONE-. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3658

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fremont Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

KEITH FUDENNA

CARL W. MORRIS

BART SCHENONE-

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KING, RICHARD W

KING, BONNIE CLAIRE

Minor

KING, JOHNNA CLAIRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JOHNSON, ROBERT LOWELL

 

Court Documents

Probate Examiner's Check List for petition to appoint guardian Filed

10/29/2003: Probate Examiner's Check List for petition to appoint guardian Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List for petition to appt. guardian; 1/30/04 Filed

1/22/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List for petition to appt. guardian; 1/30/04 Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List for proof of blocked acct; 4/23/04 Filed

4/15/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List for proof of blocked acct; 4/23/04 Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List For hrg 6/11/04 Filed

6/4/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List For hrg 6/11/04 Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List For hrg 8/27/04 Filed

8/20/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List For hrg 8/27/04 Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List for petition for reimbursement on 10/22/04 Filed

10/14/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List for petition for reimbursement on 10/22/04 Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List For hrg on blocked acct Filed

10/15/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List For hrg on blocked acct Filed

Examiner's Notes re Petition to Terminate Guardianship of Estate for 5/21/10

5/7/2010: Examiner's Notes re Petition to Terminate Guardianship of Estate for 5/21/10

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Termination of Guardianship; Judge: Carl W. Morris; Department: Dept 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketOrder Terminating Guardianship Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketPetition for Termination of Guardianship Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExaminer's Notes re Petition to Terminate Guardianship of Estate for 5/21/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Richard W King

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketProbate 05/21/2010 09:30 AM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • DocketPetition for Termination of Guardianship Filed by Richard W King

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2004
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Allowance of Fees; Judge: Keith Fudenna; Department: Dept 602

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2004
  • DocketAssessment and Order for Court Investigator Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Examiner's Check List for petition to appt. guardian; 1/30/04 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2003
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Estate; Judge: Keith Fudenna; Department: Dept 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2003
  • DocketHearing Continued to Probate dept: 602 date: 01/30/2004 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2003
  • DocketGuardianship Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Examiner's Check List for petition to appoint guardian Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2003
  • DocketConfidential Guardian Screening Form Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2003
  • DocketDuties of Guardian Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2003
  • DocketProbate 11/07/2003 01:30 PM D- 602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2003
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Estate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON, ROBERT LOWELL